skip to content

Mehdar, Albayda Mustafa H

CPSO#: 99936

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Mar 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Nov 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Hospital
339 Windermere Rd
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 May 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALBAYDA MUSTAFA H MEHDAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEHDAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 04 Mar 2013 to 04 May 2013
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 05 May 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 13 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 14 Dec 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 13 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 14 Dec 2016 to 05 Feb 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 06 Feb 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 05 Feb 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology

The University of Western Ontario, 06 Feb 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 May 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 2018