skip to content

Meghji, Mohamed Hassan

CPSO#: 94418

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Swahili, Urdu

Education:Jawaharlal Nehru Medical College, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal West Medical Clinic
305 Royal West Drive
Brampton ON  L6X 5K8
Phone: 905-452-0200
Fax: 905-452-0212 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Pharmalinx Clinic
Unit 2 - 9301 Bathurst Street
Richmond Hill, Ontario, L4C 9S2
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9S2
Canada
Phone: 905-237-7472
Fax: 905-237-2854
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. M.Hassan Meghji Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 02 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Meghji ( CPSO# 94418 )

Business Address:
2 - 9301 Bathurst Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9S2
Phone Number: (905) 237-7472

Business Address:
305 Royal West Drive
Brampton ON  L6X 5K8
Phone Number: (905) 452-0200

Business Address:
90 Resolution Drive
Brampton ON  L6W 0A7
Phone Number: (416) 320-2591

Business Address:
11 Lakeside Terrace
Barrie ON  L1M 0H9
Phone Number: (888) 282-7763

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MOHAMED HASSAN MEGHJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEGHJI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Sep 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 13 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Jul 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2011