skip to content

Meghani, Hamidah Kurban

CPSO#: 86584

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Halton Region Health Department
1151 Bronte Rd.
Oakville ON  L6M 3L1
Phone: (905) 825-6000 Ext. 7806 Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist
Public Health and Preventive Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HAMIDAH KURBAN MEGHANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEGHANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

University Of Toronto, 31 Aug 2010 to 30 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine

University Of Toronto, 31 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2009