skip to content

Medline, Norton Millard

CPSO#: 17893

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Jun 1961
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 1961

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
115 Midair Court
Brampton ON  L6T 5M3
Phone: 905 790 3000
Fax: 905 790 9659 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: N. Medline Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 30 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Medline ( CPSO# 17893 )

Business Address:
115 Midair Court
Brampton ON  L6T 5M3
Phone Number: (905) 790-3000

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 28 Nov 1966 RCPSC Specialist
Dermatology Effective: 09 Apr 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NORTON MILLARD MEDLINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEDLINE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1960
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1961
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1961