skip to content

Mechulan, Alexis

CPSO#: 92735

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Oct 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 11 Jan 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Aix-Marseille II, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 21 May 2010 to 03 Jun 2010
PEAP - R - Cardiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 04 Jun 2010 to 31 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 17 Nov 2010 to 10 Jan 2011
PEAP - CF - Cardiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 11 Jan 2011 to 31 Oct 2011
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 May 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2011