skip to content

Mech, Zdislaw Romuald

CPSO#: 15813

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Sep 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 15 Sep 2015
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:University of Toronto, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place Toronto, ON M9L 0A3 Tel: 1 800 775 0093
Date Received: 10 Sep 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1961 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1956
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Oct 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 11 Oct 2012
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 11 Aug 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Sep 2015

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: September 15, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective September 15, 2015, Dr. Mech has resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.