skip to content

Meads, George Edgar

CPSO#: 18660

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2005
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1966 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 1963
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jan 1967
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2005