skip to content

Meade, Judith Anne

CPSO#: 18038

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1961
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Jul 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jan 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012
Member Portal will be undergoing maintenance between 09:00 pm and 12:00 am on Thursday April 18, 2019. We apologize for the inconvenience.