Mdallal, Ahmed Mahmoud Saleh (CPSO#: 99330)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 23 Nov 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 Nov 2014

Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Jordan University of Sci. & Technology, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Hospital Privileges Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

No Privileges reported.

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  August 6, 2014
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On August 13, 2014, Kingston General Hospital notified the College that Dr. Ahmed M.S. Mdallal's privileges were temporarily suspended at Kingston General Hospital and Hotel Dieu Hospital, effective August 6, 2014.

On August 25, 2014, Kingston General Hospital notified the College that Dr. Ahmed M.S. Mdallal's privileges are reinstated at Kingston General Hospital and Hotel Dieu Hospital, effective August 26, 2014.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Sep 2012 to 23 Nov 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Queen's University, 24 Nov 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Aug 2014
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Queen's University, 01 Sep 2014 to 23 Nov 2014
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Nov 2014