skip to content

McWilliam, Morgan Stuart

CPSO#: 98032

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stratford General Hospital
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Phone: 519-273-4100 Ext. 2
Fax: 519-273-3208 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

Listowel Memorial Hospital
255 Elizabeth St E
Listowel ON  N4W 2P5
Canada
Phone: 519-291-3120
County: County of Perth
Electoral District: 02

Clinton Public Hospital
98 Shipley St
Clinton ON  N0M 1L0
Canada
Phone: (519) 482-3440
County: County of Huron
Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: M. McWilliam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mcwilliam ( CPSO# 98032 )

Business Address:
98 Shipley Street
Clinton ON  N0M 1L0
Phone Number: (519) 482-3440

Business Address:
255 Elizabeth Street East
Listowel ON  N4W 2P5
Phone Number: (519) 291-3120

Business Address:
Stratford General Hospital
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Phone Number: (519) 573-4100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MORGAN STUART MCWILLIAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCWILLIAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017