skip to content

McTavish, David Ross

CPSO#: 17897

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 Sep 2021
EXPIRY DATE
09 Sep 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 1961

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:01 Jan 1967 RCPSC Specialist
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:01 Jan 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1961
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Sep 2021