skip to content

McNiece, Lynne Carole

CPSO#: 27906

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Jun 2016
EXPIRY DATE
03 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 10 May 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 21-Sep-2020

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 1973 to 30 Jun 1974
Other - Rotating Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1974 to 30 Jun 1975
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1975 to 30 Jun 1976
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 May 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 2016