skip to content

McNaughton, Deborah Ann

CPSO#: 31526

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jun 1978
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Jun 1980

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Waters, Deborah Ann (used until: 24 Sep 2018 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
69 Main Street East
Grand Bend ON  N0M 1T0
Phone: (519) 238-2362
Fax: (519) 238-6478 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

122 King Street
Hensall ON  N0M 1X0
Canada
Phone: (519) 262-3140
Fax: (519) 262-2448
County: County of Huron
Electoral District: 02

Queensway Nursing Home
100 Queen St
Hensall ON  N0M 1X0
Canada
Phone: 519-262-2830
County: County of Huron
Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Deborah A. McNaughton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 27 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. D. McNaughton ( CPSO# 31526 )

Business Address:
69 Main Street East
Grand Bend ON  N0M 1T0
Phone Number: (519) 238-2362

Business Address:
122 King Street
Hensall ON  N0M 1X0
Phone Number: (519) 262-3140

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
South Huron Hospital Exeter

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1980 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DEBORAH ANN MCNAUGHTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCNAUGHTON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 1980