skip to content

McNaught, Andrew Fraser

CPSO#: 88015

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
835 King St W
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: 519-749-4300 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Andrew McNaught Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 08 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. McNaught ( CPSO# 88015 )

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Business Address:
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:09 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANDREW FRASER MCNAUGHT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCNAUGHT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 14 Jan 2008 to 29 Feb 2008
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Mar 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Mar 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jul 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2012