skip to content

McNamara, James Luke

CPSO#: 25837

MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 22 Dec 2003
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 22 Dec 2003
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Monash University, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Specified Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1973
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee Effective: 08 Oct 2003
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 22 Dec 2003

Previous Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 22 Dec 2003
Summary:

 On December 22, 2003, the Discipline Committee found Dr. McNamara to have committed acts of 
 professional misconduct for sexual impropriety with a patient and conduct that would be regarded 
 as disgraceful, dishonourable and unprofessional.  The Committee also found Dr. McNamara to be 
 incompetent.  The Committee ordered the Registrar to revoke Dr. McNamara(s certificate of 
 registration immediately.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Dec 22, 2003