skip to content

McNamara, Iain Robert

CPSO#: 96676

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Oxford University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2011 to 24 Oct 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 25 Oct 2011 to 31 Jul 2012
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2012