skip to content

McNally, James Dayre

CPSO#: 87579

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CHEO
Department of Paediatrics
Critical Care Medicine
401 Smyth Road Room 3002C
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 3553 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. James Dayre McNally Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 28 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. McNally ( CPSO# 87579 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Department of Paediatric
Critical Care Medicine
401 Smyth Road Room 3002C
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 727-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:29 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective:27 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JAMES DAYRE MCNALLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCNALLY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 27 Aug 2007 to 23 Sep 2007
EL - Paediatric Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 07 Jan 2008 to 01 Feb 2008
EL - Rheumatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 08 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Ottawa, 09 Sep 2009 to 08 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Ottawa, 09 Sep 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Critical Care

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Sep 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2010