skip to content

McNally, Edward Anthony

CPSO#: 96884

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Oct 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 Feb 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
220 Bagot St
Kingston ON  K7L 5E9
Phone: (613) 533-9303 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Shalini Sharma and Edward McNally Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 26 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sharma ( CPSO# 94513 )
Dr. E. McNally ( CPSO# 96884 )

Business Address:
75 Charles Street
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Phone Number: (613) 345-5645

Business Address:
220 Bagot Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5E9
Phone Number: (613) 533-9303

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:10 Oct 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. EDWARD ANTHONY MCNALLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCNALLY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 25 Oct 2011 to 16 Jan 2012
AVP - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 17 Jan 2012 to 24 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 25 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 21 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 22 Oct 2013 to 07 Apr 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2014