skip to content

McNair, Susan Mary Ann

CPSO#: 93307

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Aug 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Aug 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 308
1 Young Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 1T8
Phone: 365-323-2152
Fax: 905-525-5681 Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:10 Aug 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SUSAN MARY ANN MCNAIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCNAIR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 20 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 21 Jul 2011 to 20 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 21 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 20 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 21 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 10 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 11 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 10 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Aug 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2015