skip to content

McNair, David James

CPSO#: 21645

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 20 Jul 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 20 Jul 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Group Health Centre 240 MacNabb Street Sault Ste Marie ON P6B 1Y5
Date Received: 20 Jul 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:13 Mar 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Apr 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Jul 2017