skip to content

McMillan, Aimée Lydia May

CPSO#: 95109

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Nith Valley Family Practice
Unit 1
10 Waterloo Street
New Hamburg ON  N3A 1V5
Phone: (519) 662-1551
Fax: (519) 662-1402 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Aimee McMillan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 14 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. McMillan ( CPSO# 95109 )

Business Address:
Nith Valley Family Practice
Suite 1
10 Waterloo Street
New Hamburg ON  N0B 2G0
Phone Number: (519) 662-1551

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AIMÉE LYDIA MAY MCMILLAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCMILLAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2013