skip to content

McMaster, Robert George

CPSO#: 86869

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 31 Dec 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Dec 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 1 - 3
1001 Queen Street West
Toronto ON  M5S 2G8
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 30195 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

105-1111 Finch Ave W
North York ON  M3J 2E5
Canada
Phone: 4167366279
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

160 Horner Avenue
Toronto, ON
Toronto ON  M8Z0C2
Canada
Phone: (416) 354-4030
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

661 Martin Street
Milton ON
Milton ON  L9T3V9
Canada
Phone: 9058788141
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

East Detention Centre
50 Civic Road Scarborough ON
Scarborough ON  M1L2K9
Canada
Phone: 4167503513
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

College Street Site
CAMH
250 College Street, Toronto ON
Toronto ON  M5T1R8
Canada
Phone: 4165358501
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Scarborough CATC
Scarborough ON  M1R 2Z4
Canada
Phone: 416-637-1061
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

IHC
385 Rexdale Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9W 1R9
Canada
Phone: 416-401-8505
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Robert McMaster Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 04 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. McMaster ( CPSO# 86869 )

Business Address:
Units 1 and 3
1001 Queen Street West
Toronto ON  M5S 2G8
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Business Address:
105 - 1111 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3J 2E5
Phone Number: (416) 736-6279

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:31 Dec 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROBERT GEORGE MCMASTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCMASTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2013