skip to content

McLorie, Gordon Arthur

CPSO#: 24257

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 21 Jul 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 05 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1969
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Jun 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 1971
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jul 2010