skip to content

McLeod, Jocelin Ann

CPSO#: 95598

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Mar 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Desjardins, Jocelin Ann (used until: 06 Feb 2014 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical Sch, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Jocelin McLeod Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 12 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. McLeod ( CPSO# 95598 )

Business Address:
288 St. Paul Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 3M9
Phone Number: (905) 684-9339

Business Address:
95 Darling Street
Brantford ON  N3T 3A4
Phone Number: (519) 720-0712

Business Address:
14 John Street
Hamilton ON  L8R 1G9
Phone Number: (905) 546-0050

Business Address:
711 Concession St
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3

Business Address:
237 Barton St E
Hamilton General Hospital
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:03 Mar 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOCELIN ANN MCLEOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCLEOD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 09 Mar 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2014