skip to content

McLean, Richard Finlay

CPSO#: 31944

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Aug 1980
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
North York ON  M3M 0B1
Phone: 2894397594 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Richard F. McLean Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 15 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. R. McLean ( CPSO# 31944 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 04 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RICHARD FINLAY MCLEAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCLEAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1985