skip to content

McLean, Patrick Robert

CPSO#: 29383

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Patrick Robert McLean Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 18 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Elliot LakeFamily Health Team 31 Nova Scotia Walk Elliot Lake ON P5A 1Y9 Tel: 705-848-3673
Date Received: 09 Sep 2016

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017