skip to content

McLean, Ian Ross

CPSO#: 13563

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Queen's University, 1951

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1957 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1951
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Sep 1959
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1960
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012