skip to content

McLaughlin, Peter Ross

CPSO#: 23620

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Jun 1971
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 1971

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Administration
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 743-2121 Ext. 3280 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Peter R. McLaughlin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 21 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. P. McLaughlin ( CPSO# 23620 )

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 11 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PETER ROSS MCLAUGHLIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCLAUGHLIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1970
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1971