skip to content

McLaughlin, Christopher Ryan

CPSO#: 97983

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Jul 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 304
4256 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6E4
Phone: 905-358-6121
Fax: 905-358-1626 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Christopher McLaughlin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER RYAN MCLAUGHLIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCLAUGHLIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2017