skip to content

McLaren-Barnett, Anya Therese

CPSO#: 95612

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Sep 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: McLaren, Anya Therese (used until: 15 Sep 2019 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Children's Hospital
3A-1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: 905 521 2100 Ext. 73508
Fax: 905 524 5707 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto Sleep and Pulmonary Centre
123 Edward Street
Suite #1011
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Canada
Phone: (416) 813-2277
Fax: (416) 260-3203
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective:09 Nov 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANYA THERESE MCLAREN-BARNETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCLAREN-BARNETT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Oct 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Sep 2017
CF - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2015