skip to content

McLaren, Jesse Thomas Tigar

CPSO#: 85444

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Feb 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Feb 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
R Fraser Elliot Building
Ground Floor, Room 480
Toronto ON  M5G2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3856
Fax: (416)340-4300 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Jesse McLaren Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 25 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. McLaren ( CPSO# 85444 )

Business Address:
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (647) 888-1737

Business Address:
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-2581

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:12 Nov 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JESSE THOMAS TIGAR MCLAREN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCLAREN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Aug 2006 to 31 Aug 2006
EL - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Feb 2008