skip to content

McKinnon, Maxine Elizabeth

CPSO#: 28797

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 09 Jul 2009
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1865 Rogers Rd
Office #5
Perth ON  K7H 0B2
Phone: (613)812-0455
Fax: (613)267-2526 Electoral District: 07

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 15 Jun 1974 to 14 Jun 1975
Other - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1975 to 30 Jun 1976
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1976 to 30 Jun 1977
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Feb 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Sep 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jan 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Jun 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Oct 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 May 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2009

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 09 Jul 2009 Active
             Dr. Maxine Elizabeth McKinnon may practise medicine independently as a GP
            Psychotherapist, only.