skip to content

McKinnon, Allison Arlene

CPSO#: 86264

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 309
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone: (613) 274-7831 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

876 Montreal Rd
Ottawa ON  K1K4L3
Canada
Phone: 6137428182
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Allison McKinnon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 17 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. McKinnon ( CPSO# 86264 )

Business Address:
Department of OB/Gyn
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Business Address:
876 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 4L3
Phone Number: (613) 742-8182

Business Address:
Suite 309
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone Number: (613) 274-7831

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:07 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALLISON ARLENE MCKINNON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCKINNON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 25 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 26 Aug 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 07 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 08 Jun 2010 to 07 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 08 Jun 2011 to 07 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 08 Jun 2012 to 07 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 2013