skip to content

McKim, John Stewart

CPSO#: 12461

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Apr 2002
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 16 Apr 2002

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 24-Jun-2004

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1946

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jan 1952 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1947
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Dec 1960
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 1963
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Apr 2002