skip to content

McKibbin, Timothy Giles

CPSO#: 28658

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Jan 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 09 Jan 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: T. G. McKibbin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 27 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: 201-1370 Clyde Avenue, Ottawa, ON K2E 3H8
Date Received: 09 Jan 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:11 Jun 1980 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:02 Dec 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Jan 2017