skip to content

McKeown, Kevin John

CPSO#: 86640

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4001 Leslie Street
Rm 1SE-157
Department of Anesthesia
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6000
Fax: (855) 756-3454 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

20 20 Wynford Dr
Toronto ON  M3C 1J4
Canada
Phone: (416) 441-2111
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: K.J. McKeown Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 10 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. K. McKeown ( CPSO# 86640 )

Business Address:
4001 Leslie Street
Room 1SE-157
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Don Mills Surgical Unit Limited Toronto
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KEVIN JOHN MCKEOWN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCKEOWN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

Western University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012