skip to content

McKeown, Emily Jane

CPSO#: 86789

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Sep 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Kovacs, Emily Jane (used until: 18 Jul 2007 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite M1-400
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4580
Fax: (416) 480-4233 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

107-1100 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2K2W1
Canada
Phone: 416-777-0004
Fax: 416 826 0009
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre,Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective:31 Dec 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. EMILY JANE MCKEOWN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCKEOWN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2012