skip to content

McKenna, Manjot Kaur

CPSO#: 96935

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 Jan 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 Jan 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Grewal, Manjot Kaur (used until: 05 Jan 2014 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin Trinity College, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brant Community Healthcare System
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill St.
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone: (519) 751-5544 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

London Health Sciences Center
University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Canada
Phone: 5196858500 Ext. 13053
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Manjot McKenna Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 28 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MANJOT KAUR MCKENNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCKENNA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 25 Oct 2011 to 17 Jan 2012
AVP - Family Medicine

Western University, 18 Jan 2012 to 24 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 25 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 24 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Oct 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2014