skip to content

McKechnie, Catherine Mary

CPSO#: 86639

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
701 Rossland road
suite 6
Whitby ontario
Whitby ON  L1N 8Y9
Phone: (905) 493-3447
Fax: (905) 493-4303 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Catherine McKechnie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 03 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. C. McKechnie ( CPSO# 86639 )

Business Address:
701 Rossland Road East
Suite 6
Whitby ON  L1N 8Y9
Phone Number: (905) 493-3447

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CATHERINE MARY MCKECHNIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCKECHNIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009