skip to content

McIsaac, Joseph Hugh

CPSO#: 29482

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Jul 1977
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 30 Apr 2019
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 116
152 Cleopatra Drive
Ottawa ON  K2G 5X2
Phone: (613) 236-8182
Fax: (613) 236-8154 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: J. Hugh McIsaac Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 24 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. McIsaac ( CPSO# 29482 )

Business Address:
116 - 152 Cleopatra Drive
Ottawa ON  K2G 5X2
Phone Number: (613) 236-8182

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1982 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Apr 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 30 Apr 2019

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 30 Apr 2019 Active
             As from April 30, 2019, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and
            limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Joseph Hugh McIsaac,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. McIsaac to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. JOSEPH HUGH McISAAC
                                          ("Dr. McIsaac")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended;

                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "IEP" means Individualized Education Plan;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public;
                  
                  "QAC" means the Quality Assurance Committee of the College.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. McIsaac, certificate of registration number 29482, am a member of
                  the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. McIsaac, acknowledge that concerns have been identified with
                  respect to my knowledge, skill and judgment. I am aware of the College's
                  concern about protecting the public.

            B.    UNDERTAKING 

            (4)   I, Dr. McIsaac, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective upon the date this Undertaking is approved by the QAC
                  ("Effective Date").

            (5)   Clinical Supervision

                  (a)   I, Dr. McIsaac, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor or supervisors acceptable to the College (the
                        "Clinical Supervisor" or "Clinical Supervisors"), for twelve (12)
                        months ("Clinical Supervision").
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. McIsaac, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor. The
                        Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum:
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the IEP attached
                              as Appendix "B";
                  
                        (ii)  Review the materials provided by the College and have an
                              initial meeting to discuss practice improvement
                              recommendations;
                  
                        (iii) After the initial meeting described at section 5(b)(ii), meet
                              with me at my Practice Location, or another location approved
                              by the College, biweekly for four (4) meetings, then monthly
                              for ten (10) meetings;
                  
                        (iv)  Review at least fifteen (15) of my patient charts at every
                              meeting;
                  
                        (v)   Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (vi)  Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations;
                  
                        (vii) Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor deems necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (viii)Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              month, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor has
                              concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. McIsaac, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor based on the educational needs
                        identified in the IEP set out at Appendix "B" to my Undertaking, as
                        well as the areas of concern identified in the report of the
                        assessor dated November 23, 2018, and concerns that may arise
                        during the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. McIsaac, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice described in section (5) of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" attached, and undertake to abide by
                        the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor, including but not
                        limited to recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development. 
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. McIsaac, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the Effective Date.

                  (f)   I, Dr. McIsaac, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. McIsaac, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor as set out in sections (5)(e) and (5)(f) above,
                        including returning a signed Appendix "A" within thirty (30) days,
                        I will cease practising medicine until such time as I have obtained
                        a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. McIsaac, acknowledge that if I am required to cease practise
                        as a result of section (5)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and said
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (6)   Professional Education

                  (a)   I, Dr. McIsaac, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as
                        Appendix "B", including all of the following professional education
                        (the "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   review and discuss with my Clinical Supervisor the following
                              resources:
                  
                              1.    Diabetes Canada - 2018 Clinical Practice Guidelines
                  
                              2.    Canadian Cardiovascular Society - Framingham Risk
                                    Calculator
                  
                              3.    Hypertension Canada - 2018 Hypertension Prevention and
                                    Treatment Guidelines
                  
                              4.    American Psychiatric Association - Guideline for the
                                    Treatment of Patients with Major Depressive Disorder
                  
                              5.    Patient Health Questionnaire (PHQ-9)
                  
                              6.    UpToDate - Non-Steroidal Anti-Inflammatory Drugs,
                                    Beyond the Basics
                  
                              7.    College Policy - Prescribing Drugs
                  
                              8.    Choosing Wisely Canada for Family Physicians
                  
                              9.    Canadian Guideline for Safe and Effective Use of
                                    Opioids for Chronic Non-Cancer Pain
                  
                              10.   College Policy - Medical Records
                  
                              11.   Cancer Care Ontario Screening Guidelines for Cervical,
                                    Breast and Colon Cancer
                  
                              12.   College Policy - Test Results Management; and
                  
                        (ii)  the following programs:

                              1.    Diabetes Update 2017
                  
                              2.    University of Toronto Medical Recordkeeping Course
                  
                              3.    CMPA e-learning modules: Documentation and
                                    Documentation II; and
                  
                                    (iii) any additional professional education recommended
                                          by my Clinical Supervisor.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. McIsaac, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. McIsaac, acknowledge that a report or reports may be
                        provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with
                        the Professional Education.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. McIsaac, undertake to complete this requirement by July 31,
                        2019 or, if no satisfactory program is available by that time, by
                        the first possible opportunity thereafter.
                  
            (7)   Reassessment of Practice  

                  (a)   I, Dr. McIsaac, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after
                        the completion of the Clinical Supervision and the Professional
                        Education set out above and in Appendix "A" and Appendix "B"
                        attached, I will submit to a reassessment of my practice (the
                        "Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors selected by the College
                        (the "Assessor" or "Assessors").  I acknowledge that the
                        Reassessment may include a chart review, direct observation of my
                        care, interviews with colleagues and co-workers, feedback from
                        patients and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. McIsaac, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment
                        conducted under section (7) of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. McIsaac, acknowledge and provide consent that my Clinical
                        Supervisor may receive and review the findings of the Assessor, and
                        may discuss with the Assessor any issues or concerns arising from
                        the Reassessment. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. McIsaac, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment
                        will be provided to me and reported to the College and the
                        Reassessment may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
            (8)   Monitoring

                  (a)   I, Dr. McIsaac, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent
                        Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction
                        (collectively my "Practice Location" of "Practice Locations"),
                        within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward,
                        I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new
                        Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at
                        that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. McIsaac, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient
                        records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring
                        my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT 

            (9)   I, Dr. McIsaac, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. McIsaac, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking.

            (11)  I, Dr. McIsaac, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (12)  I, Dr. McIsaac, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs
                  of Staff").

            (13)  I, Dr. McIsaac, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in any one or more of the following:
                  consideration by the QAC, an investigation by the College, or further
                  action by the College, including a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            (14)  I, Dr. McIsaac, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (15)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. McIsaac, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. McIsaac, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. McIsaac's
                              knowledge, skill and judgment. As a result:
                  
                                    Dr. McIsaac will practise under the guidance of a
                                    Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 12
                                    months.

                                    Dr. McIsaac will engage in professional education in
                                    medical record-keeping, and with respect to several
                                    clinical guidelines and tools.
                  
                                    Dr. McIsaac's practice will be reassessed by an
                                    assessor selected by the College approximately six (6)
                                    months following the end of the period of Clinical
                                    Supervision.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (16)  I, Dr. McIsaac, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that
                  may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                  compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (17)  I, Dr. McIsaac, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form,
                  attached hereto as Appendix "C".

            (18)  I, Dr. McIsaac, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who facilitates my completion of the
                  Professional Education and to all Clinical Supervisors and Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (19)  I, Dr. McIsaac, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chiefs of Staff with any information arising from the monitoring of my
                  compliance with this Undertaking.

            (20)  I, Dr. McIsaac, give my irrevocable consent to all Clinical Supervisors,
                  Chiefs of Staff, Assessors, and any persons who facilitate my completion
                  of the Professional Education, to disclose to the College, and to one
                  another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A";
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and

                  (e)   which comes to their attention in the course of providing the
                        Professional Education and which they reasonably believe indicates
                        a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: April 30, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Joseph Hugh McIsaac to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 30, 2019:

Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. McIsaac’s knowledge, skill and judgment. As a result:

• Dr. McIsaac will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 12 months.

• Dr. McIsaac will engage in professional education in medical record-keeping, and with respect to several clinical guidelines and tools.

• Dr. McIsaac’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College approximately six (6) months following the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.