skip to content

McIntyre, William Finlay

CPSO#: 92940

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 Apr 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Apr 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Arrhythmia Service
McMaster University
Hamilton Health Sciences
30 Birge St
Hamilton ON  L8L 0A6
Phone: 905-521-2100 Ext. 40414
Fax: 905-297-3786 Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:16 Nov 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. WILLIAM FINLAY MCINTYRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCINTYRE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 7 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2016