skip to content

McIntyre, Martin Thomas Joseph

CPSO#: 26506

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Martin McIntyre Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 25 2019

Medical Records Location

Address: 9 Lafayette Ave Brantford ON N3T 5B4
Date Received: 07 May 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 10 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019