skip to content

McIntyre, Kathryn Stacey

CPSO#: 98034

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 May 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Thomas Elgin General Hospital
189 Elm St.
St. Thomas ON
N5R 5C4
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4
Phone: 519-207-9100
Fax: 519-207-9200 Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
General Internal Medicine Effective:26 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 May 2017