skip to content

McIntosh, James Duncan

CPSO#: 18628

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Mar 2002
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 15 Nov 1990

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1961
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Jun 1962
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 1963
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Nov 1990
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 15 Nov 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Mar 2002