skip to content

McIntosh, Glenda June

CPSO#: 29900

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 06 Jan 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 16 May 1978

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: McIntosh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 1 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: Whitby Clinic 200 Brock Street North Whitby ON L1N 4H5
Date Received: 06 Jan 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1978 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 May 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jan 2017