McIntosh, Frederick Edward Aldrick (CPSO#: 22015)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jun 1969

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 04 Mar 2019

Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of West Indies, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 5
1209 King Street West
Toronto ON  M6K 1G2
Phone: (416) 536-2500
Fax: (416) 532-7006
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 22 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1969
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 04 Mar 2019

Pending Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Summary: Allegations of Dr. McIntosh’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. McIntosh is incompetent and/or failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in his care of patients and engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct in his record keeping and his referral practises including: referring patients for excessive and unnecessary testing; failing to ensure his patients received only necessary tests; and in his prescribing of orthoses.

Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status More Information
member Effective: 04 Mar 2019 Active View Details [+]
            As from March 4, 2019, the following terms, conditions and limitations are
            imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Frederick Edward Aldrick
            McIntosh in accordance with an undertaking and consent Dr. McIntosh has given
            to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT

                                          ("Undertaking") of

                                 DR. FREDERICK EDWARD ALDRICK MCINTOSH

                                          ("Dr. McIntosh") to

                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")

            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended;
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. McIntosh, certificate of registration number 22015, am a member of
                  the College.

            (3)   I, Dr. McIntosh, acknowledge that the College has referred to the
                  Discipline Committee, in the matter of College File Numbers 7215243 and
                  7215932, allegations that I failed to maintain the standard of practice
                  of the profession and engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable, and
                  unprofessional conduct in my diagnostic imaging referral practices and my
                  prescribing of orthoses.

            (4)   I, Dr. McIntosh, have read the Notice of Hearing dated January 23, 2019,
                  which sets out the allegations against me. I am aware of the College's
                  concern about protecting the public and I understand the nature of the
                  allegations against me.

            (5)   I, Dr. McIntosh, acknowledge that the College has accepted this
                  Undertaking in lieu of making an Order under section 25.4 of the Code at
                  this time.

            (6)   I, Dr. McIntosh, acknowledge that this Undertaking does not preclude the
                  ICR Committee from making an order at a later date in accordance with the
                  Code.

            (7)   I, Dr. McIntosh, acknowledge that this Undertaking continues in force
                  until the matters currently referred are disposed of by a panel of the
                  Discipline Committee.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (8)   I, Dr. McIntosh, undertake to abide by the provisions of this
                  Undertaking, effective immediately.

            (9)   I, Dr. McIntosh, undertake to keep a Log of all patients whom I refer for
                  diagnostic imaging, as set out in the form attached in Schedule "A",
                  which will include at least the following information (the "Imaging
                  Log"):

                  (a)   the date of the appointment;
                  
                  (b)   the name of the patient and chart/file number;
                  
                  (c)   the imaging tests ordered;
                  
                  (d)   the clinical indication;
                  
                  (e)   Dr. McIntosh's signature;
                  
                  (f)   a copy of each requisition form;
                  
                  (g)   the date of the Clinical Supervisor's review (if applicable, as set
                        out below); and,
                  
                  (h)   the Clinical Supervisor's signature (if applicable, as set out
                        below).
                  
            (10)  I, Dr. McIntosh, undertake to keep a Log of all prescriptions for medical
                  devices, including orthoses, as set out in the form attached as Schedule
                  "B", which will include at least the following (the "Prescribing Log")

                  (a)   the date of the appointment;
                  
                  (b)   the name of the patient and chart/file number;
                  
                  (c)   the type of device prescribed;
                  
                  (d)   the clinical indication;
                  
                  (e)   Dr. McIntosh's signature;
                  
                  (f)   the date of the Clinical Supervisor's review (if applicable, as set
                        out below); and,
                  
                  (g)   the Clinical Supervisor's signature (if applicable, as set out
                        below.
                  
                  
            (11)  Clinical Supervision

                  (a)   I, Dr. McIntosh, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor or clinical supervisors acceptable to the
                        College (the "Clinical Supervisor" or "Clinical Supervisors"), as
                        set out below ("Clinical Supervision").
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. McIntosh, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor. The
                        Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum:
                  
                        (i)   Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location
                              approved by the College, once every month;
                  
                        (ii)  Review the Imaging Log and the Prescribing Log;
                  
                        (iii) Review at least twenty-five (25) of my patient charts at
                              every meeting, which shall be selected by the Clinical
                              Supervisor from the Prescribing Log and the Imaging Log,
                              independent of my participation, on the basis of the areas of
                              concern identified in the 4 medical inspectors' reports,
                              dated July 23, 2018- November 2, 2018, and any concerns that
                              arise during the period of Clinical Supervision or if since
                              the Clinical Supervisor's prior review there are not twenty
                              five (25) patients listed in the Prescribing Log and the
                              Imaging Log whom I have referred for diagnostic imaging or to
                              whom I have prescribed medical devices, the charts of all
                              patients listed in the Prescribing Log and the Imaging Log.
                              If since the Clinical Supervisor's prior review there are no
                              patient charts listed in the Prescribing Log and the Imaging
                              Log, the Clinical Supervisor will not review charts during
                              that meeting;
                  
                        (iv)  Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (v)   Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor deems necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (vi)  Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              quarter, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor has
                              concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. McIntosh, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor from the Prescribing Log and
                        the Imaging Log, based on the areas of concern identified in the 4
                        medical inspectors' reports, dated July 23, 2018- November 2, 2018,
                        and concerns that may arise during the period of Clinical
                        Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. McIntosh, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" attached, and to abide by the
                        recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor, including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. McIntosh, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. McIntosh, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. McIntosh, acknowledge that if I am unable to obtain a
                        Clinical Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections
                        (11)(e) and/or (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until
                        such time as I have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to
                        the College.
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. McIntosh, acknowledge that if I am required to cease
                        practise as a result of section (11)(g) above this will constitute
                        a term, condition or limitation on my Certificate of Registration
                        and that term, condition or limitation will be included on the
                        public register.
                  
            (12)  I, Dr. McIntosh, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                  location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited
                  to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent Health
                  Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively
                  my "Practice Locations"), within five (5) days of executing this
                  Undertaking. Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of
                  any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing
                  practice at that location.

            (13)  I, Dr. McIntosh, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with,
                  unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and and to any other
                  activity the College deems necessary in order to monitor my compliance
                  with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (14)  I, Dr. McIntosh, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (15)  I, Dr. McIntosh, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (16)  I, Dr. McIntosh, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking.

            (17)  I, Dr. McIntosh, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (18)  I, Dr. McIntosh, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs
                  of Staff").

            (19)  I, Dr. McIntosh, acknowledge that, in the event of an appeal of any Order
                  of the Discipline Committee, if the Discipline Committee has directed the
                  Registrar to revoke, suspend, or impose terms and conditions on my
                  certificate of registration, that Order will take effect immediately
                  despite any appeal.

            (20)  I, Dr. McIntosh, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code.

            (21)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. McIntosh, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. McIntosh, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (21)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Dr. McIntosh is the subject of a referral to the Discipline
                              Committee into allegations of failure to maintain the
                              standard of practice of the profession and disgraceful,
                              dishonourable or unprofessional conduct with respect to his
                              diagnostic imaging referrals and his prescribing of orthoses.
                              After the referral:
                  
                              Dr. McIntosh has agreed to practise under the guidance of a
                              Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College with respect to
                              his ordering of diagnostic imaging and his prescribing of
                              medical devices.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (22)  I, Dr. McIntosh, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP, and/or any person who or institution that
                  may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                  compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.


            (23)  I, Dr. McIntosh, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form,
                  attached hereto as Appendix "B".

            (24)  I, Dr. McIntosh, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  the following information to all Clinical Supervisors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (25)  I, Dr. McIntosh, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (26)  I, Dr. McIntosh, give my irrevocable consent to all Clinical Supervisors
                  and Chiefs of Staff to disclose to the College, and to one another, any
                  of the following:

                  (a)   any information relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information relevant to the provisions of the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking set out at Appendix "A";
                  
                  (c)   any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                        compliance with this Undertaking.
                  
                  

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: March 4, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Frederick Edward Aldrick McIntosh to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 4, 2019:


Dr. McIntosh is the subject of a referral to the Discipline Committee into allegations of failure to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct with respect to his diagnostic imaging referrals and his prescribing of orthoses. After the referral:

Dr. McIntosh has agreed to practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College with respect to his ordering of diagnostic imaging and his prescribing of medical devices.