skip to content

McGurk, Francis Myrle

CPSO#: 31042

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2005
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Aug 2005

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Edinburgh, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jan 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Oct 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Oct 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Sep 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Sep 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Dec 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2000
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Jun 2000
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Jun 2001
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Aug 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Aug 2005