skip to content

McGuire, Anna Louise

CPSO#: 84757

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Jul 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 29 Jul 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Suite 7115, 2775 Laural Street, VGH, DHCC, Vancouver, BC V5Z 1M9
Date Received: 29 Jul 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 30 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 7 - Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 29 Mar 2015
Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Jul 2015