skip to content

McGuffin, Dominique

CPSO#: 93450

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Aug 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 28 Sep 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Braidwood, Dominique (used until: 17 Dec 2013 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Guelph General Hospital 115 Delhi St Guelph ON N1E 4J4
Date Received: 04 Jun 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:22 Dec 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Dec 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2019