skip to content

McGonigal, Michael Joseph

CPSO#: 29638

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2003
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University of Belfast, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 10 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Jun 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2003
Member Portal will be undergoing maintenance between 09:00 pm and 12:00 am on Thursday April 18, 2019. We apologize for the inconvenience.